Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 295 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5210 Week
» 16447 Month
» 249367 Year
» 1914743 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80022 on 20/11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 20/11/1951 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Sat 26/06/1965
Service Life 13 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
61A   Kittybrewster (New) on 20/11/1951
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 16/06/1962
     Withdrawn on 26/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66A Polmadie on 20/11/1951
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 09/06/1962
WDN   w/e 26/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/12/1951 Scottish Miscellany Of the B.R. 2-6-4T Nos. 80020-2 are at Kittybrewster, 80023/6 at Polmadie and 80024/5 at Corkerhill. Ivatt 2-6-0 43133 has arrived at Eastfield depot. Ex-L.M.S. Class 5 4-6-0s now work regularly over the West Highland line. During the New Year week V2 class engines worked frequently on the Edinburgh-Glasgow turns. Towards the end of December Class J39 64750 was noted being towed to Cowlairs Works after a 'pitch-in.' Regular Sunday cheap day excursion tickets are now being given from Glasgow to more distant towns, e.g., by 7.15 a.m. to Grantown-on-Spey West; Hawick by 9.40 a.m. SLS/195203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/11/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80022
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
26/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80022    
09/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev