Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 265 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5180 Week
» 16417 Month
» 249337 Year
» 1914713 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80023 on 27/11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 27/11/1951
Withdrawal Sat 02/10/1965
Service Life 13 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 27/11/1951
68C   Stranraer 4w/e 16/06/1962
67E   Dumfries 4w/e 16/03/1963
     Withdrawn on 02/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66A Polmadie on 27/11/1951
ALLOC 67F Stranraer 4w/e 07/07/1962
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 5w/e 13/10/1962
ALLOC 67E Dumfries 4w/e 06/04/1963
WDN   on 02/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/12/1951 Scottish Miscellany Of the B.R. 2-6-4T Nos. 80020-2 are at Kittybrewster, 80023/6 at Polmadie and 80024/5 at Corkerhill. Ivatt 2-6-0 43133 has arrived at Eastfield depot. Ex-L.M.S. Class 5 4-6-0s now work regularly over the West Highland line. During the New Year week V2 class engines worked frequently on the Edinburgh-Glasgow turns. Towards the end of December Class J39 64750 was noted being towed to Cowlairs Works after a 'pitch-in.' Regular Sunday cheap day excursion tickets are now being given from Glasgow to more distant towns, e.g., by 7.15 a.m. to Grantown-on-Spey West; Hawick by 9.40 a.m. SLS/195203
21/05/1955 Clyde Coast Of the batch of standard class 5 engines allotted to Polmadie, Nos. 73055-73064 all work alongside class 4 2-6-4 tanks on passenger duties. The latest arrivals are 73075/6 with large tenders. Standard 2-6-4 tanks now handle almost half of the Clyde Coast passenger traffic, the remainder being of Fairburn variety. No. 80023 spent a short while on loan recently to Ladyburn, likewise No. 80003 at Princes Pier, but none of these engines is as yet stationed at Greenock. Latest arrivals at Polmadie are Doncaster-built Nos. 80111/5. New light 2-6-0 of classes 3 and 4 appear on night freight duties from the Motherwell direction; No. 77009, for a time stabled at Greenock, is now at Polmadie, while No. 77008 is at Princes Pier on passenger duties. On 25th June, No. 76001, of Perth, appeared on an excursion from Glenboig to Gourock. Class 3F Nos. 57552/6 and class 2F No. 57268 still handle the principal freight turns from Greenock; Caley Bogies Nos. 54456 an 54506 appear quite regularly on freight duty and at the end of June No. 54497 emerged after being in store for over six months. On Friday, 1st July, a 'Starlight' special left Gourock for the south at 6.45 p.m., doubleheaded by Nos. 73057 an 72000. Earlier, the stock for this train had been worked down by compound No. 41155 of Ayr shed, a type now very rare on this line. SLS/195508

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/11/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80023
Built at Brighton Works
   
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stranraer (68C)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (67E)    
02/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80023    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane    

prev prev