Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 269 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5184 Week
» 16421 Month
» 249341 Year
» 1914717 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80029 on 22/01/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Thu 22/01/1952
Withdrawal Thu 16/12/1965
Service Life 13 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 22/01/1952
67D   Ardrossan 4w/e 01/07/1961
67B   Hurlford 4w/e 14/07/1962
     Withdrawn on 16/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 61A Kittybrewster on 22/01/1952
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 07/07/1962
WDN   on 16/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/03/1952 Easter Workings on the Buchan line With the arrival of the new Class 4MT 2-6-4 tanks at Kittybrewster, some of the turns on the Buchan section have been taken over by the new locomotives. 80020 works the 11.22 No. 1 Express-the 'Fisher' -from Fraserburgh to Kittybrewster while 80029 handles the 16.02 passenger Aberdeen-Fraserburgh. However, many of the Aberdeen-Fraserburgh trains are still worked by locomotives of the old D40, D41, B1 or B12 classes. A B1 is in charge of the 12.25 passenger from Fraserburgh and 62260, 62276 'Andrew Bain' or 62279 'Glen Grant' deals with the 12.50 goods to Kittybrewster. But the most startling change has taken place on the St. Combs Light Railway. Here Class 2MT 2-6-0, No. 46460, shedded at 64A, has been fitted with cowcatchers 'fore and aft' (to use a nautical phrase) and has taken over the duties previously performed by ex-G.E.R. 2-4-2 tanks 67151 an 67164, both of which have been scrapped. But 67157, of the same class, still lingers on and shares duties with the new engine. The crews consider that 46460 is an excellent machine, but I was informed that, some time after its arrival, it was reported for working 10lb. over pressure! SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/01/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80029
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
16/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80029    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane    

prev prev