Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80030 on 05/02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Mon 05/02/1952 to Ayr (67C)
Withdrawal Mon 08/06/1964
Service Life 12 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Arnott Young (Troon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
67C   Ayr (New) on 05/02/1952
67A   Corkerhill on 11/03/1952
67D   Ardrossan on 06/10/1958
67A   Corkerhill on 02/02/1959
     Withdrawn on 08/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 67C Ayr on 05/02/1952
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 14/02/1959
WDN   on 08/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
St. Rollox Works 15/09/1953 09/10/1953 25 days Light Intermediate    
St. Rollox Works 07/12/1955 24/12/1955 18 days Light Intermediate    
St. Rollox Works 30/11/1956 07/12/1956 8 days Light Casual    
Cowlairs Works 21/04/1958 10/05/1958 20 days General    
Cowlairs Works 04/10/1960 29/10/1960 26 days Light Intermediate    
Cowlairs Works 21/03/1961 31/03/1961 11 days Light Casual    
Cowlairs Works 22/08/1961 09/09/1961 19 days Light Casual    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/03/1952 Scottish Miscellany The new 'Clans' are working regularly between Stranraer and Glasgow, down with the 11.44 ex Stranraer and up with the 17.10 ex St. Enoch, working to Stranraer, from Carlisle. The 80000 class 4 tanks are also working regularly between St. Enoch and Ayr and Girvan, the latest noted being 80030.
An unusual working was noted from Ayr on 19/4, the day of the Scottish Football Cup Final. A special left Ayr at 12.06 for. King's Park. Glasgow, by way of Kilmarnock, Lugton spur to Lugton East, and then the old Lanarkshire and Ayrshire to Cathcart West Junction, thence to King's Park. This necessitated the reversal of the train at Kilmarnock, where it was taken over by a Glasgow engine with Hurlford pilot. There was no return working, passengers being left to find their way back by an evening train from Glasgow.
SLS/195206
30/08/1961 Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D2708/70/4, 44783, 45213, 45361, 61324/46/96, 65919, 80030, 90017, 90386, 90463, 90614. Valve Shop: 73077. Stripping Shop: 65923. Weigh House: 64847. Paint Shop: 73099. Works Yard: D2434, D2726, D3393, 44485, 61178, 64932, 72009, 73005, 80045, 90753. Scrap Yard: 64710 intact, 64700 being out-up. Works Shunters: D2760, D3418. SLS/196110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/02/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80030
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Ayr (67C)
   
11/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
15/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/09/1953. Dep: 09/10/1953.    
07/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 07/12/1955. Dep: 24/12/1955.    
30/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/11/1956. Dep: 07/12/1956.    
21/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1958. Dep: 10/05/1958.    
06/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
02/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
04/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/10/1960. Dep: 29/10/1960.    
21/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/03/1961. Dep: 31/03/1961.    
22/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/08/1961. Dep: 09/09/1961.    
08/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80030    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon    

prev prev