Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 216 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5131 Week
» 16368 Month
» 249288 Year
» 1914664 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80031 on 02/02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 02/02/1952 to Brighton (75A)
Withdrawal Sun 20/09/1964
Service Life 12 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1965 at Steel Supply Co. (West Drayton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
75A   Brighton (New) on 02/02/1952
75B   Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
     Withdrawn on 20/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 75A Brighton 8w/e 19/03/1952
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 20/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Eastleigh Works 01/09/1953 12/09/1953 12 days Light Casual    
Brighton Works 16/06/1954 26/06/1954 11 days Light Casual    
Eastleigh Works 09/03/1955 26/03/1955 18 days Light Intermediate    
Brighton Works 05/12/1955 13/12/1955 9 days Light Casual    
Eastleigh Works 31/08/1956 29/09/1956 30 days Heavy Casual    
Eastleigh Works 07/03/1958 29/03/1958 23 days Heavy Casual    
Ashford Works 08/09/1958 03/10/1958 26 days Non Classified    
Eastleigh Works 03/07/1959 08/08/1959 37 days Light Intermediate    
Eastleigh Works 29/03/1961 06/05/1961 39 days General    
Ashford Works 05/09/1961 23/09/1961 19 days Light Casual    
Eastleigh Works 28/08/1963 07/09/1963 11 days Light Casual    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/08/1959 Fawley branch On 24th August 82012/15 were observed on an up petrol train and 80031 was shunting. It is proposed to run block petrol trains from Fawley to Bromford bridge and to accommodate this traffic, extensive improvements are to be made to the crossing and siding facilities. SLS/195910
07/09/1963 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/02/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80031
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Brighton (75A)
   
01/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1953. Dep: 12/09/1953.    
16/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/06/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954.    
09/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/03/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955.    
05/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/12/1955. Dep: 13/12/1955.    
31/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 31/08/1956. Dep: 29/09/1956.    
07/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958.    
08/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Ashford Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 08/09/1958. Dep: 03/10/1958.    
03/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 03/07/1959. Dep: 08/08/1959.    
29/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961.    
05/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Ashford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/09/1961. Dep: 23/09/1961.    
28/08/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1963. Dep: 07/09/1963.    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
20/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80031    
03/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Steel Supply Co.: West Drayton    

prev prev