Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 257 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5172 Week
» 16409 Month
» 249329 Year
» 1914705 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80033 on 18/03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 18/03/1952 to Brighton (75A)
Withdrawal Sun 02/10/1966
Service Life 14 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Cox and Danks (Park Royal)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
75A   Brighton (New) on 18/03/1952
75B   Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
70B   Feltham 4w/e 08/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 02/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 75A Brighton 8w/e 19/03/1952
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
TOSTORE 70B Feltham P 06/06/1965
WDN   w/e 02/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Ashford Works 20/10/1952 29/10/1952 10 days Non Classified    
Eastleigh Works 31/03/1953 11/04/1953 12 days Light Casual    
Brighton Works 05/02/1954 11/02/1954 7 days Light Casual    
Derby Works 29/11/1954 20/12/1954 22 days Light Intermediate    
Eastleigh Works 23/10/1956 17/11/1956 26 days General    
Brighton Works 09/09/1957 13/09/1957 5 days Light Casual    
Eastleigh Works 09/02/1959 28/02/1959 20 days Light Intermediate    
Eastleigh Works 15/09/1960 15/10/1960 31 days General    
Eastleigh Works 20/06/1962 04/08/1962 46 days Light Intermediate    
Eastleigh Works 03/10/1963 26/10/1963 24 days Light Casual    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/03/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80033
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Brighton (75A)
   
20/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Ashford Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 20/10/1952. Dep: 29/10/1952.    
31/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/03/1953. Dep: 11/04/1953.    
05/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1954. Dep: 11/02/1954.    
29/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/11/1954. Dep: 20/12/1954.    
23/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1956. Dep: 17/11/1956.    
09/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/09/1957. Dep: 13/09/1957.    
09/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/02/1959. Dep: 28/02/1959.    
15/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1960. Dep: 15/10/1960.    
20/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 20/06/1962. Dep: 04/08/1962.    
03/10/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/10/1963. Dep: 26/10/1963.    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
02/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80033    
03/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Park Royal    

prev prev