Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 217 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5132 Week
» 16369 Month
» 249289 Year
» 1914665 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80034 on 01/04/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 01/04/1952 to Crewe North (5A)
Withdrawal Sun 02/01/1966
Service Life 13 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Cox and Danks (Park Royal)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
5A   Crewe North (New) on 01/04/1952
1C   Watford on 31/05/1952
73F   Ashford 5w/e 31/12/1959
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 28/05/1962
75A   Brighton 4w/e 19/08/1963
75B   Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
70B   Feltham 4w/e 08/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 02/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5A Crewe North w/e 05/04/1952
ALLOC 1C Watford 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 28/05/1962
ALLOC 75A Brighton 8w/e 19/08/1963
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
TOSTORE 70B Feltham P 06/06/1965
WDN   w/e 02/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Derby Works 06/12/1954 04/01/1955 30 days Intermediate    
Derby Works 28/05/1957 05/07/1957 39 days Heavy General    
Eastleigh Works 01/09/1960 24/09/1960 24 days Light Intermediate    
Eastleigh Works 17/01/1963 23/02/1963 38 days General    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/01/1963 Eastleigh Works (erecting shop) In erecting shop: 4634, 31619, 31800/16/73, 33009/12, 34031/9/70, 35001/15, 41296/9, 73002/51, 76005/62, 80034/43/82/162, 82014/24, 92206. In Works yard: 30512, 31618, 34054, 35006, 41291, 80035, 82022. On scrap sidings behind Works: 30504, 30903/4, 31414, 31904, 32352. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/04/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80034
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Crewe North (5A)
   
31/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Watford (1C)    
06/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/12/1954. Dep: 04/01/1955.    
28/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/05/1957. Dep: 05/07/1957.    
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
01/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/09/1960. Dep: 24/09/1960.    
28/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
17/01/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1963. Dep: 23/02/1963.    
19/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
02/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80034    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Park Royal    

prev prev