Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 257 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5172 Week
» 16409 Month
» 249329 Year
» 1914705 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80036 on 23/05/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Fri 23/05/1952 to Watford (1C)
Withdrawal Fri 06/11/1964
Service Life 12 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
1C   Watford (New) on 23/05/1952
73F   Ashford 5w/e 31/12/1959
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 28/05/1962
     Withdrawn on 06/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1C Watford w/e 24/05/1952
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 28/05/1962
WDN   w/e 09/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Derby Works 26/07/1955 22/08/1958 1124 days Intermediate    
Darlington Works 15/05/1958 13/06/1958 30 days General    
Eastleigh Works 28/10/1960 19/11/1960 23 days Heavy Intermediate    
Ashford Works 20/12/1961 13/01/1962 25 days Light Casual    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1952 Southern Miscellany New standard Class '4' 2-6-4Ts for service elsewhere continue to be completed at Brighton and run in from the shed there, including journeys on the evening through train to Tonbridge and back, Nos. 80036-9 being recently noted.
New Crewe-built Class '2' 2-6-2Ts numbered 41310-2 allocated to Faversham are the first of the type to operate in East Kent. In addition to Sheerness branch and associated short main line trips they also work to Dover. Nos. 41313-5 commenced running from Brighton to Lewes, Eastbourne, and etc., during June when Nos. 41316-7 were expected soon to be ready as part of the allocation of the last four to Eastbourne which may include duties from St. Leonards.
There is an 'E' Class Wainwright 4-4-0 still carrying Southern Railway number preceded by an 's'-s1491 stationed at Redhill at the time of writing. For several days it operated the through Tonbridge-Eastbourne turn in place of the Class '2' Eastbourne L.M.R. tank, also running to Reading and Tonbridge or Ashford. The other two remaining un-rebuilt 'Es' work from Faversham and Gillingham, the latter including duty 225 running from Tonbridge to Redhill, then after an interval to Reading and back. There is also Guildford duty 225 (Western Section) to be found on the Redhill-Reading line, a Drummond L.S.W.R. 4-4-0 turn.
'U' Class 2-6-0s have been noted working through from Andover to Cheltenham, M.S.W. Junction route, also together with S.R. 0-6-0s through Reading to Oxford or Banbury.
Two lined black 'E3' 0-6-2Ts really belonging to a Goods Class are Nos. 32166, 32459.
On June 7th, the advance portion of the Birkenhead-Hastings train was hauled by Atlantic No. 32422, North Foreland, which made a fast run with nine coaches from Redhill to Brighton (having been to Kensington,. Olympia, in the morning on the up relief routed via High Wycombe); 'L' Class 4-4-0, 31769 Brighton-Eastbourne; standard 2-6-4T, 80017 on to Hastings which worked goods back to Polegate at night. Atlantics will no doubt play a valuable part in haulage of summer trains to and from Brighton and Newhaven again this summer. One sometimes goes up light early on Saturday mornings from Newhaven to haul a relief boat express back from Victoria.
Continental freight trains often formed to a considerable extent with braked, dual fitted Italian or similar European waggons are run several times daily each way between Dover and Southwark Depot or other London yard with timings occupying 2½-3 hr. according to route with a service stop, loaded or empty, with not less than one-third fully braked. 'King Arthur' locomotives are often employed. Their maximum load via Tonbridge is 425 tons; with light Pacifics, 500 tons; 'N' Class Mogul, 400 and so on. On account of the severity of grading, loads are reduced if Chatham or Maidstone (East) routes used.
A light Pacific has been turned at Eastbourne Shed though only with difficulty.
SLS/195208
02/06/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop, no. 1 bay) Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. SLS/195806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/05/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80036
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Watford (1C)
   
26/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/07/1955. Dep: 22/08/1958.    
15/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1958. Dep: 13/06/1958.    
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
28/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/10/1960. Dep: 19/11/1960.    
20/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Ashford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/12/1961. Dep: 13/01/1962.    
28/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
06/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80036    
03/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev