Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 224 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5139 Week
» 16376 Month
» 249296 Year
» 1914672 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80037 on 24/05/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Mon 24/05/1952 to Watford (1C)
Withdrawal Mon 07/03/1966
Service Life 13 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
1C   Watford (New) on 24/05/1952
73F   Ashford 5w/e 31/12/1959
73J   Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 28/05/1962
72A   Exmouth Junction 5w/e 02/07/1962
82F   Bath Green Park (S&D) 2w/e 10/01/1965
83D   Exmouth Junction 2w/e 07/03/1965
83G   Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 13/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 07/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1C Watford w/e 24/05/1952
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 25/06/1962
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 5w/e 04/01/1965
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 2w/e 07/03/1965
ALLOC 83G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 13/06/1965
WDN   3w/e 12/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Derby Works 16/02/1955 10/03/1955 23 days Intermediate    
Derby Works 08/08/1957 05/09/1957 29 days Heavy General    
Eastleigh Works 23/06/1960 30/07/1960 38 days Light Intermediate    
Ashford Works 06/09/1961 30/09/1961 25 days Light Casual    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1952 Southern Miscellany New standard Class '4' 2-6-4Ts for service elsewhere continue to be completed at Brighton and run in from the shed there, including journeys on the evening through train to Tonbridge and back, Nos. 80036-9 being recently noted.
New Crewe-built Class '2' 2-6-2Ts numbered 41310-2 allocated to Faversham are the first of the type to operate in East Kent. In addition to Sheerness branch and associated short main line trips they also work to Dover. Nos. 41313-5 commenced running from Brighton to Lewes, Eastbourne, and etc., during June when Nos. 41316-7 were expected soon to be ready as part of the allocation of the last four to Eastbourne which may include duties from St. Leonards.
There is an 'E' Class Wainwright 4-4-0 still carrying Southern Railway number preceded by an 's'-s1491 stationed at Redhill at the time of writing. For several days it operated the through Tonbridge-Eastbourne turn in place of the Class '2' Eastbourne L.M.R. tank, also running to Reading and Tonbridge or Ashford. The other two remaining un-rebuilt 'Es' work from Faversham and Gillingham, the latter including duty 225 running from Tonbridge to Redhill, then after an interval to Reading and back. There is also Guildford duty 225 (Western Section) to be found on the Redhill-Reading line, a Drummond L.S.W.R. 4-4-0 turn.
'U' Class 2-6-0s have been noted working through from Andover to Cheltenham, M.S.W. Junction route, also together with S.R. 0-6-0s through Reading to Oxford or Banbury.
Two lined black 'E3' 0-6-2Ts really belonging to a Goods Class are Nos. 32166, 32459.
On June 7th, the advance portion of the Birkenhead-Hastings train was hauled by Atlantic No. 32422, North Foreland, which made a fast run with nine coaches from Redhill to Brighton (having been to Kensington,. Olympia, in the morning on the up relief routed via High Wycombe); 'L' Class 4-4-0, 31769 Brighton-Eastbourne; standard 2-6-4T, 80017 on to Hastings which worked goods back to Polegate at night. Atlantics will no doubt play a valuable part in haulage of summer trains to and from Brighton and Newhaven again this summer. One sometimes goes up light early on Saturday mornings from Newhaven to haul a relief boat express back from Victoria.
Continental freight trains often formed to a considerable extent with braked, dual fitted Italian or similar European waggons are run several times daily each way between Dover and Southwark Depot or other London yard with timings occupying 2½-3 hr. according to route with a service stop, loaded or empty, with not less than one-third fully braked. 'King Arthur' locomotives are often employed. Their maximum load via Tonbridge is 425 tons; with light Pacifics, 500 tons; 'N' Class Mogul, 400 and so on. On account of the severity of grading, loads are reduced if Chatham or Maidstone (East) routes used.
A light Pacific has been turned at Eastbourne Shed though only with difficulty.
SLS/195208

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/05/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80037
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Watford (1C)
   
16/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/02/1955. Dep: 10/03/1955.    
08/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/08/1957. Dep: 05/09/1957.    
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
23/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/06/1960. Dep: 30/07/1960.    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
06/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Ashford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/09/1961. Dep: 30/09/1961.    
28/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
10/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
07/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G)    
07/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80037    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev