Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 292 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5207 Week
» 16444 Month
» 249364 Year
» 1914740 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80041 on 05/07/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Mon 05/07/1952 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal Mon 07/03/1966
Service Life 13 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
1E   Bletchley (New) on 05/07/1952
73F   Ashford 5w/e 31/12/1959
73J   Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961
72A   Exmouth Junction 5w/e 02/07/1962
83G   Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 13/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 07/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 05/07/1952
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 25/06/1962
ALLOC 83G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 13/06/1965
WDN   3w/e 12/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/05/1960 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
21/05/1960 Water scoop gear removed
21/05/1960 Briquette tube feeder fitted


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Derby Works 28/07/1953 20/08/1953 24 days Non Classified Pistons & Valves
 
Derby Works 18/04/1955 13/05/1955 26 days Intermediate    
Derby Works 20/05/1955 23/05/1955 4 days No repairs    
Derby Works 14/08/1957 25/09/1957 43 days Heavy General    
Eastleigh Works 29/04/1960 21/05/1960 23 days Heavy Intermediate Water scoop gear removed
 
Ashford Works 11/07/1960 23/07/1960 13 days Non Classified    
Ashford Works 20/03/1961 21/03/1961 2 days Non Classified    
Ashford Works 14/06/1961 08/07/1961 25 days Light Casual    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/07/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80041
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
   
28/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 28/07/1953. Dep: 20/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Pistons & Valves
   
18/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/04/1955. Dep: 13/05/1955.    
20/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/05/1955. Dep: 23/05/1955.    
14/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/08/1957. Dep: 25/09/1957.    
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
29/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/04/1960. Dep: 21/05/1960.
Work undertaken:
Water scoop gear removed
   
11/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Ashford Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 11/07/1960. Dep: 23/07/1960.    
20/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Ashford Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 20/03/1961. Dep: 21/03/1961.    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
14/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Ashford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1961. Dep: 08/07/1961.    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G)    
07/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80041    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev