Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 263 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5178 Week
» 16415 Month
» 249335 Year
» 1914711 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80042 on 15/07/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 15/07/1952 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal Sat 06/02/1965
Service Life 12 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1965 at Hayes (Bridgend)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
1E   Bletchley (New) on 15/07/1952
73F   Ashford 5w/e 31/12/1959
73J   Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961
72A   Exmouth Junction 5w/e 02/07/1962
     Withdrawn on 06/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 19/07/1952
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 25/06/1962
WDN   2w/e 07/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
19/03/1960 Water scoop gear removed


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Derby Works 17/08/1955 08/09/1955 23 days Intermediate    
Derby Works 19/09/1955 29/09/1955 11 days Not Classified Hot box
 
Derby Works 22/10/1957 04/12/1957 44 days Heavy General    
Eastleigh Works 25/02/1960 19/03/1960 24 days Heavy Intermediate Water scoop gear removed
 
Ashford Works 02/05/1961 27/05/1961 26 days Light Casual    
Eastleigh Works 09/10/1961 21/10/1961 13 days Not Classified    
Exmouth Junction (on shed) 03/01/1963 05/02/1963 34 days Light Casual    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1960 Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop:-30060/6/133/247/701/88, 34011/5/27/8/33/61/82/92/106, 41304, 73082/112/4, 76019, 80039/42/83/137; Boxhill. Dump:-30770; Ex-works:- 32103, 34050/70, 41312; Waiting works:-30056/129/4035/504, 76055, 80140; Ex-works:- 32104 (75C), 73050 (82F), 80095 (6C) plate, 73118; On shed (damaged):- 34084. SLS/196004
07/09/1963 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/07/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80042
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
   
17/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/08/1955. Dep: 08/09/1955.    
19/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 29/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Hot box
   
22/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 22/10/1957. Dep: 04/12/1957.    
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
25/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/02/1960. Dep: 19/03/1960.
Work undertaken:
Water scoop gear removed
   
02/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Ashford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/05/1961. Dep: 27/05/1961.    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
09/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 09/10/1961. Dep: 21/10/1961.    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
03/01/1963 Works Visit Depot Repair - Exmouth Junction (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/01/1963. Dep: 05/02/1963.    
06/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80042    
05/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend    

prev prev