Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 295 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5210 Week
» 16447 Month
» 249367 Year
» 1914743 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80044 on 21/08/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 21/08/1952 to Derby (17A)
Withdrawal Sat 14/11/1964
Service Life 12 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1965 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
17A   Derby (New) on 21/08/1952
15D   Bedford on 20/12/1952
26D   Bury (on loan) on 08/01/1955
26A   Newton Heath (on loan) on 11/02/1956
26A   Newton Heath (loan made permanent) on 27/11/1957
67A   Corkerhill on 14/03/1960
     Withdrawn on 14/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 17A Derby w/e 23/08/1952
ALLOC 15D Bedford 4w/e 27/12/1952
LOAN 26D Bury 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 09/04/1960
WDN   on 08/06/1964
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 08/08/1964
WDN   w/e 14/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Derby Works 08/09/1955 29/09/1955 22 days Intermediate    
Derby Works 07/07/1958 27/08/1958 52 days UNK    
Horwich Works 11/11/1959 23/11/1959 13 days Weighing    
Cowlairs Works 30/06/1960 12/07/1960 13 days Light Casual    
Cowlairs Works 04/10/1961 28/10/1961 25 days Light Intermediate    
Cowlairs Works 19/02/1963 23/02/1963 5 days Light Casual    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/07/1958 Derby Works (Works yard) 28th July. Paint shop-42348 I, 42391 G, 43459 I, 47434 G, 47660 I, 75037 G. Diesel Erecting shop-15000/4, D8015; new work order D658-nos. 34-42 (D3536-44), nos. 49-52 (D3551-4) frames only. Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay- 40010 G, 42181 I, 42303 I, 42322 G, 42336 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42481 Casual, 42529, 42541 G, 47275, 47289 I, 47504 I, 47552 G, 48002 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 48696 I and 75034 G; Steam erecting shop, no. 2 bay- 40657 I, 42308 I, 42369 G, 42528 G, 44146 Casual, 44288, 47333 G, 47470 G and 48694 I. Steam erecting shop, No. 3 bay- new work, main line diesel; Nos. 2-10 (D5001-9) Bo-Bo; D1 an D2 1-Co-Co-1. Works yard- 12066, 40047, 40680, 41106, 42525, 43356, 43997, 44046, 44135, 44161, 47309, 48024, 80044 an D3530. Test House- D5000; this returned from inspection on 24th July from Marylebone and is the first main line diesel-electric built at Derby under M. Plan-it is painted in B.R. green with grey roof and grey-green waist band about 1' thick around centre and B.R. crests below waist-bands at no. 2 cab end. 1160 h.p., Sulzer diesel engine, B.T.H. elec. equipment. SLS/195808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/08/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80044
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
20/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (15D)    
08/01/1955 Allocation Loaned to Bury (26D)    
08/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/09/1955. Dep: 29/09/1955.    
11/02/1956 Allocation Loaned to Newton Heath (26A)    
07/07/1958 Works Visit      
11/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Horwich Works (Weighing) - Arr: 11/11/1959. Dep: 23/11/1959.    
14/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
30/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/06/1960. Dep: 12/07/1960.    
04/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/10/1961. Dep: 28/10/1961.    
19/02/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/02/1963. Dep: 23/02/1963.    
14/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80044    
01/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev