Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 235 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5150 Week
» 16387 Month
» 249307 Year
» 1914683 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80046 on 17/09/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Mon 17/09/1952 to Bedford (15D)
Withdrawal Mon 01/05/1967
Service Life 14 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1967 at Campbells (Airdrie)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
15D   Bedford (New) on 17/09/1952
26D   Bury 4w/e 29/01/1955
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 25/02/1956
24E   Blackpool Central 4w/e 30/11/1957
67A   Corkerhill on 04/02/1960
     Withdrawn on 01/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 15D Bedford w/e 20/09/1952
LOAN 26D Bury 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 13/02/1960
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   on 06/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Derby Works 17/08/1954 20/09/1954 35 days Light Intermediate    
Derby Works 27/06/1957 16/08/1957 51 days General    
Cowlairs Works 25/04/1960 11/06/1960 48 days Heavy Intermediate    
Cowlairs Works 29/10/1963 28/12/1963 61 days General    
Cowlairs Works 01/02/1966 05/02/1966 5 days Light Casual EO
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/09/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80046
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Bedford (15D)
   
17/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/08/1954. Dep: 20/09/1954.    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
27/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1957. Dep: 16/08/1957.    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
04/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
25/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/04/1960. Dep: 11/06/1960.    
29/10/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1963. Dep: 28/12/1963.    
01/02/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/02/1966. Dep: 05/02/1966.
Work undertaken:
EO
   
01/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 80046    
08/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev