Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80048 on 13/10/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 13/10/1952 to Kentish Town (14B)
Withdrawal Sat 17/07/1965
Service Life 12 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Birds (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
14B   Kentish Town (New) on 13/10/1952
6A   Chester (MR) on 15/09/1956
67A   Corkerhill on 22/04/1960
     Withdrawn on 08/06/1964
6H   Bangor (Reinstated) on 18/07/1964
6D   Shrewsbury w/e 19/09/1964
     Withdrawn on 17/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 14B Kentish Town w/e 18/10/1952
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 07/05/1960
WDN   on 08/06/1964
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 3w/e 03/10/1964
WDN   w/e 17/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Derby Works 08/05/1953 03/06/1953 27 days Heavy Casual Boiler repairs
 
Derby Works 04/11/1954 26/11/1954 23 days Light Casual Tank repairs
 
Derby Works 04/08/1955 30/08/1955 27 days Light Intermediate    
Derby Works 16/02/1956 03/03/1956 17 days Light Casual    
Derby Works 26/09/1956 26/10/1956 31 days Light Casual    
Derby Works 24/05/1958 01/07/1958 39 days Heavy General    
Cowlairs Works 23/10/1961 08/12/1961 47 days Heavy Intermediate    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/06/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop, no. 1 bay) Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. SLS/195806
26/03/1966 Awaiting Disposal (Shrewsbury) Shrewsbury: 7801/2/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, 41209, 42174, 42777, 46508, 48716, 73000/25/34/50/67/70, 75028/38, 80048/78/101/36, 84000/4, 90222/563/641; Stafford: 42958/64/82, 46527, 47480/666/777, 48112 (mainly labelled to Cashmore's, Great Bridge). SLS/196605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/10/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80048
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Kentish Town (14B)
   
08/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/05/1953. Dep: 03/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler repairs
   
04/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1954. Dep: 26/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tank repairs
   
04/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/08/1955. Dep: 30/08/1955.    
16/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/02/1956. Dep: 03/03/1956.    
15/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
26/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1956. Dep: 26/10/1956.    
24/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/05/1958. Dep: 01/07/1958.    
22/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
23/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/10/1961. Dep: 08/12/1961.    
18/07/1964 Reinstated Reinstated to Bangor (6H)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
17/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80048    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Morriston    

prev prev