Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 239 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5154 Week
» 16391 Month
» 249311 Year
» 1914687 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80049 on 24/10/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Mon 24/10/1952 to Newton Heath (26A)
Withdrawal Mon 08/06/1964
Service Life 11 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Arnott Young (Troon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
26A   Newton Heath (New) on 24/10/1952
26A   Newton Heath on 08/11/1952
6A   Chester (MR) on 15/09/1956
67A   Corkerhill on 05/05/1960
     Withdrawn on 08/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 24E Blackpool Central w/e 25/10/1952
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 07/05/1960
WDN   on 08/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Derby Works 08/09/1955 29/09/1955 22 days Intermediate    
Derby Works 09/12/1957 24/01/1958 47 days Heavy General    
Cowlairs Works 17/09/1960 08/10/1960 22 days Light Intermediate    
Cowlairs Works 14/12/1962 29/12/1962 16 days Heavy Casual    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/10/1952 Brighton Works 80049 left shops on the due date, (24/10). 80050 due on (6/11) has cylinders and bunker mounted, to be followed by 80051 on (19/11). Another pair of frames is set up and the final pair for the current order in shops. SLS/195212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/10/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80049
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Newton Heath (26A)
   
08/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
08/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/09/1955. Dep: 29/09/1955.    
15/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
09/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/12/1957. Dep: 24/01/1958.    
05/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
17/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/09/1960. Dep: 08/10/1960.    
14/12/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/12/1962. Dep: 29/12/1962.    
08/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80049    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon    

prev prev