Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 280 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5195 Week
» 16432 Month
» 249352 Year
» 1914728 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80054 on 04/12/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Wed 04/12/1954
Withdrawal Wed 29/06/1966
Service Life 11 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 04/12/1954
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 25/12/1954
64A   St Margarets on 13/08/1962
66D   Greenock Ladyburn on 21/11/1965
     Withdrawn on 29/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66A Polmadie on 04/12/1954
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 6w/e 18/08/1962
ALLOC 66D Greenock Ladyburn 3w/e 27/11/1965
WDN   on 26/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Cowlairs Works 23/12/1957 25/01/1958 34 days Light Intermediate    
Cowlairs Works 10/12/1958 27/12/1958 18 days Light Casual    
Cowlairs Works 27/11/1961 06/01/1962 41 days General    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/12/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80054
Built at Derby Works
   
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
23/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/12/1957. Dep: 25/01/1958.    
10/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/12/1958. Dep: 27/12/1958.    
27/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1961. Dep: 06/01/1962.    
13/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    
21/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
29/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80054    

prev prev