Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 3 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2078 Week
» 27439 Month
» 260359 Year
» 1925735 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80055 on 23/12/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Fri 23/12/1954 to Polmadie (66A)
Withdrawal Fri 02/09/1966
Service Life 11 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
66A   Polmadie (New) on 23/12/1954
64A   St Margarets on 13/08/1962
     Withdrawn on 02/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66A Polmadie on 23/12/1954
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 6w/e 18/08/1962
WDN   on 02/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
St. Rollox Works 07/06/1956 07/06/1956 1 day Non Classified    
St. Rollox Works 07/09/1956 28/09/1956 22 days Light Casual    
St. Rollox Works 01/04/1957 21/06/1957 82 days Light Intermediate    
Cowlairs Works 28/04/1958 16/05/1958 19 days Light Casual    
Cowlairs Works 26/04/1960 18/06/1960 54 days General    
Cowlairs Works 23/07/1963 24/08/1963 33 days Heavy Intermediate    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/12/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80055
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
07/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 07/06/1956. Dep: 07/06/1956.    
07/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/09/1956. Dep: 28/09/1956.    
01/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/04/1957. Dep: 21/06/1957.    
28/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1958. Dep: 16/05/1958.    
26/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1960. Dep: 18/06/1960.    
13/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
23/07/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/07/1963. Dep: 24/08/1963.    
02/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80055    
10/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane    

prev prev