Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 217 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5132 Week
» 16369 Month
» 249289 Year
» 1914665 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80056 on 30/12/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 30/12/1954 to Polmadie (66A)
Withdrawal Sat 10/10/1964
Service Life 9 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
66A   Polmadie (New) on 30/12/1954
65A   Eastfield 4w/e 19/01/1963
     Withdrawn on 10/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66A Polmadie on 30/12/1954
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 7w/e 29/12/1962
WDN   on 11/07/1964
REINS 10D Lostock Hall 4w/e 05/09/1964
WDN   w/e 10/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/12/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80056
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
10/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80056    
11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev