Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 282 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5197 Week
» 16434 Month
» 249354 Year
» 1914730 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80057 on 31/12/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 31/12/1954 to Polmadie (66A)
Withdrawal Sat 31/12/1966
Service Life 12 yrs

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1967 at Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
66A   Polmadie (New) on 31/12/1954
65A   Eastfield on 29/12/1962
66A   Polmadie on 18/02/1965
     Withdrawn on 31/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66A Polmadie on 31/12/1954
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 7w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 3w/e 06/03/1965
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
St. Rollox Works 11/11/1957 06/12/1957 26 days Light Intermediate    
Cowlairs Works 27/08/1958 20/09/1958 25 days Light Casual    
Cowlairs Works 17/11/1959 09/12/1959 23 days Light Casual    
Cowlairs Works 01/05/1961 10/06/1961 41 days General    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80057
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
11/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/11/1957. Dep: 06/12/1957.    
27/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958.    
17/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1959. Dep: 09/12/1959.    
01/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1961. Dep: 10/06/1961.    
29/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
18/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
31/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80057    
04/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane    

prev prev