Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 257 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5172 Week
» 16409 Month
» 249329 Year
» 1914705 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80058 on 08/01/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sun 08/01/1955 to Polmadie (66A)
Withdrawal Sun 17/07/1966
Service Life 11 yrs, 6 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Metal Industries (Faslane)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
66A   Polmadie (New) on 08/01/1955
     Withdrawn on 17/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66A Polmadie on 08/01/1955
WDN   on 17/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
St. Rollox Works 19/10/1957 16/11/1957 29 days Light Intermediate    
Cowlairs Works 16/11/1960 17/12/1960 32 days General    
Cowlairs Works 12/02/1964 25/03/1964 43 days Heavy Intermediate    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/01/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80058
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
19/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/10/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957.    
16/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1960. Dep: 17/12/1960.    
12/02/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/02/1964. Dep: 25/03/1964.    
17/07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80058    
10/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Metal Industries: Faslane    

prev prev