Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1248 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19051 Week
» 72067 Month
» 191594 Year
» 3218447 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80059 |
on |
03/03/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
30/04/1960 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
30/04/1960 |
Bunker lamp brackets modified |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Derby Works |
|
25/05/1956 |
14/06/1956 |
21 days |
Light Intermediate |
|
|
Derby Works |
|
20/06/1956 |
27/06/1956 |
8 days |
Non Classified |
Hot box
|
|
Derby Works |
|
11/11/1957 |
17/12/1957 |
37 days |
General |
|
|
Eastleigh Works |
|
12/04/1960 |
30/04/1960 |
19 days |
Heavy Intermediate |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
|
|
Ashford Works |
|
26/05/1961 |
24/06/1961 |
30 days |
Light Casual |
|
|
Eastleigh Works |
|
03/08/1962 |
08/09/1962 |
37 days |
General |
|
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/03/1953 |
Brighton Works |
No. 80059, the first of ten new 2-6-4 tanks left the works on 3rd March; a further ten are also to be built in this 'year's programme. Engines under and awaiting repair include 30027, 30109, 30825/37, 30338, 30951/7, 32655. 30117 an 30919 have been through shops but have not been repainted. While DS515 was receiving attention here its place at Lancing was taken by 32636; 80060 was due on 2/3 but was not ready. An unusual visitor to the shed on 3rd March was 32113. |
SLS/195304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/03/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80059 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
25/05/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 25/05/1956. Dep: 14/06/1956. |
|
|
20/06/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 20/06/1956. Dep: 27/06/1956. Work undertaken: Hot box
|
|
|
15/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
11/11/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1957. Dep: 17/12/1957. |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
31/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H) |
|
|
09/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
12/04/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/04/1960. Dep: 30/04/1960. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
|
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Ashford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/05/1961. Dep: 24/06/1961. |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
03/08/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1962. Dep: 08/09/1962. |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G) |
|
|
13/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) |
|
|
18/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80059 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport |
|
|