Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 232 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5147 Week
» 16384 Month
» 249304 Year
» 1914680 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80062 on 29/04/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Mon 29/04/1953 to Kentish Town (14B)
Withdrawal Mon 12/10/1964
Service Life 11 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
14B   Kentish Town (New) on 29/04/1953
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 22/02/1958
63B   Stirling 4w/e 12/03/1960
66D   Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 22/08/1964
65J   Stirling 4w/e 22/08/1964
     Withdrawn on 12/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 14B Kentish Town w/e 02/05/1953
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 63B Stirling 4w/e 12/03/1960
ALLOC 65J Stirling 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 65J Stirling 5w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   on 12/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/06/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay) Paint Shop-44028 I, 44092 G, 44211 G, 44588 G, D3772 New. Tender for 41000. No. 2835/1902 (3500 galls). Diesel Erecting Shop-ED4, ED5, 10202, 12034/53/54/56/62. New Work 8 D-E Sh. D3773-D3780 new. Test House-D1, D3491. Diesel Finishing Shop-D2, D5019, D5700/1. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay-42400 I, 43920 I, 44229 G, 47259 I, 47623 G, 48170 G, 48184 G, 48185 I, 48192 G, 48215 G, 48420 G, 48643 I, 48690 G, 48700 G, 73033 G, 73138 I, Stripping-42305/7, 42818, 44213. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay-41000 (complete, ready for paint shop), 44202 I, 45057 Casual, 45275 Casual, 48191 I, 80062 I ; Stripping - 48180. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay-5 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D/E (D3-D7); 8 Bo-Bo, 1160 H.P. D/E (D5020-D5027). Yard-40047, 40413, 40420, 40550, 40680, 42354, 43223, 43873, 43939, 43970, 44597, 45128, 47309, 47538, 48356, 48385, 53806 Frames, 58279, 10100, 10800, 13084, D5018, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/04/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80062
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Kentish Town (14B)
   
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
12/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stirling (63B)    
22/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
22/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stirling (65J)    
12/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80062    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev