Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 263 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5178 Week
» 16415 Month
» 249335 Year
» 1914711 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80064 on 09/06/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Wed 09/06/1953 to Watford (1C)
Withdrawal Wed 25/08/1965
Service Life 12 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
1C   Watford (New) on 09/06/1953
73H   Dover Marine 5w/e 31/12/1959
73F   Ashford 6w/e 09/02/1960
73F   Ashford 4w/e 05/04/1960
73J   Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961
72A   Exmouth Junction 5w/e 02/07/1962
82E   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 13/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 25/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1C Watford w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 73F Ashford 6w/e 09/02/1960
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 25/06/1962
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 13/06/1965
WDN   on 25/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/11/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-1 bay) 14th Nov. Paint shop- 42524 I, 43975 G, 47438 I, D3561 New, D5003/4 New. D/E shop- 10202, 10800, 12043, 13057/124, 15004, ED7, 10 D/E shunters D3562-71 (Order D658, 60-69). Test House- D5002. Erecting shop-1 bay, 42349 I, 42513 G, 43994 G, 44007 I, 44245 G, 44566 G, 47599 G, 47621 G, 48026 G, 48182 I, 48212 I, 48339 I, 48352 G, 48359 G, 48503 G, 48547 G, 53802 I, 75020 G, 80064 I, 80142 I. Erecting shop-2 bay- 42230 I, 42332 I, 43844, 43972 I, 47404 I, 48114 I, 48415 I, 48662 G, 80140 I. Erecting shop-3 bay- 9 Bo-Bo D/E 1160 H,P. D5005-13, 3 1Co-Col D/E 2300 H.P. D1, D3 an D4. Yard- 40047, 40420, 40680, SLS/195812
25/02/1962 Eastleigh Works (Behind Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. SLS/196204
06/02/1966 Woodham Bros. Yard, Barry 5700 0-6-0PT-3612, 3738, 4612, 9629/81/2. 9400 0-6-0PT*9466. 4500 2-6-2T*-4561/6. 4575 2-6-2T*-4588, 5521/6/32/8/9/41/2/52/3/72. 5101 2-6-2T*-4110/5/21/41/4/56/60, 5164/93/9. 5600 0-6-2T-5619/37/68, 5693**, 6619/34/86/96. 4200 2-8-0T*-4247/8/53/70/7. 5205 2-8-0T*-5224/7/39. 7200 2-8-2T*7200/2/29. 4300 2-6-0*-5322, 7325. Hall 4-6-0*-4930/6/42/53/79/83, 5900/52/67/72. Modified Hall 4-6-0*-6989. 7903. Castle 4-6-0*-5029/43/51/80, 7027. King 4-6-0*-6023/4. 2800 2-8-0*-2807/57/9/61/73/4. 2884 2-8-0*-2885, 3802/3/14/7/22/45/50/5/62. Q 0-6-0*-30541. N 2-6-0-31874. U 2-6-0-31618/25/38, 31806. S15 4-6-0*-30499, 30506, 30825/8/30/41/7. WC and BB 4-6-2-34010/6/27/8/39/46/58/67/70/2/3/81/92/105. MN 4-6-2-35005/6/9/18/25. 4F 0-6-0 M.R.*-43924. 4F 0-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44123/422. SMT 4-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44901/5163/293/337/79/491. 8F 2-8-0-48173/431/518/624. S.D.J.R. 7F 2-8-0*-53808/9. Jubilee 4-6-0-45690/9. 4MT 2-6-0 B.R.-76017. 4MT 2-6-4T B1R.-80064/72/9/80/97/8/100/4/5/35/50. 9F 2-10-0-92207/14/9/40/5. Total: 152 locos. NOTES : * These 18 classes extinct on B.R. **5693 previously wrongly listed as 6692, even though latter was working at Stourbridge. The locos. above come from as far apart as Cornwall and Carlisle. SLS/196603
07/07/1968 Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. SLS/196810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/06/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80064
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Watford (1C)
   
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H)    
09/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
25/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80064    

prev prev