Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 32 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2107 Week
» 27468 Month
» 260388 Year
» 1925764 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80066 on 15/07/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 15/07/1953 to Watford (1C)
Withdrawal Sun 13/06/1965
Service Life 11 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Birds (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
1C   Watford (New) on 15/07/1953
73A   Stewarts Lane 5w/e 31/12/1959
73F   Ashford 6w/e 09/02/1960
73F   Ashford 4w/e 05/04/1960
73J   Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961
71A   Eastleigh 5w/e 02/07/1962
     Withdrawn on 13/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1C Watford w/e 18/07/1953
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 73F Ashford 6w/e 09/02/1960
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 25/06/1962
WDN   w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/02/1959 Derby Works (Paint shop) Paint shop-40563I, 43924G, 44606G, 47341G, 48538G, 73038G, 80066G, D5011 new. D/E Erecting shop-10000/1, 10203, 10800, 12000, 12082, 13083, 13169, D3568, D8014, new work-D3763-D3767 new. Outside-dED2. Test House-D5009/10. Erecting shop, 1 bay- 42374G, 42501G, 42520I, 44216I, 44518I, 47223G, 47379G, 47405G, 48003G, 48010G, 48317I, 48367G, 48409I, 73126I, 73159I, 75056G, 80088G, 42409 an 47376 stripping. Erecting shop, 2 bay- 42136I, 44477I, 48011I, 73125I, 73128I, 48050 stripping. Erecting shop, 3 bay- 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D/E D5012-8 new, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/Es, D5008. Yard- 40047, 40680, 42354, 43946, 43970, 47309, 48364 frames, 48517, 10100, D2910, D8001. SLS/195903
18/02/1962 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D2250, D6500/3/7, 15212, 30055, 30781, 30864, 33020, 34002/52, Erecting Shop: D3042, D3271, D3471, D5012/4, D6506/63, L.S.W.R. 120, 4694, 9667, 30045, 30515/42, 30838/43, 30955, 31795/8, 32646, 33039, 34011/18/24/66/72, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76005/19/63, 80010/65/6, 80139/41/51, 92239. Scrap Road: 30059, 30475/6, 30905, 31723. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/07/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80066
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Watford (1C)
   
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
09/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
13/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80066    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Morriston    

prev prev