Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 16 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2091 Week
» 27452 Month
» 260372 Year
» 1925748 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80067 on 04/08/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Thu 04/08/1953 to Watford (1C)
Withdrawal Thu 03/06/1965
Service Life 11 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1965 at Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
1C   Watford (New) on 04/08/1953
73A   Stewarts Lane 5w/e 31/12/1959
83G   Templecombe (S&D) 6w/e 12/10/1964
     Withdrawn on 03/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1C Watford w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 28/05/1962
ALLOC 83G Templecombe (S&D) 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   on 03/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop No 1 bay) Paint shop-42396I, 42501I, 44426I, 48010G, 48517G, D5010 new. Diesel erecting shop-10202, 10800, 11127, 12001, 12066, 12088, 13028, 6 0-6-0 DIE shunters (new work), (D3763-8). Erecting shop No 1 bay-40684I, 42409G, 42515G, 43850 G, 44123 I, 44134 I, 44179 G, 47454 G, 47645 G, 47679 I, 48141 I, 48335 G, 73142 I, 73157 I, 75015 I, 75028 G, 75031 G, 75041 G, stripping-42522, 44162, 48621, 80067. Erecting shop No. 2 bay-42374I, 44102 G, 44130 I, 47425 I, 48223(1), 73130 I, 73141 I, stripping-42529, 47526. Erecting shop No. 3 bay-6 Bo-Bo (D5014-19 new) 1160 H.P. D/E, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/E Yard-40047/564/680/1000/49/143/57/65, 42354/509/98, 43292/324, 44145/599, 47309, 48194/304/653/699, 10001, 10100, D5009/13 and Cecil Raikes. All stored locos. remain with following additions-47563 (opp. station and not for scrap), 40461, 41121, 43553/946/70, 47426 (opp. m.p.d.). *41000 was noted on 22nd March in the Erecting shop stripped down; also noted on this date in the shops were 40671 an 53807. SLS/195904
05/09/1965 Locomotives Stored at Barry (In sidings at Barry Docks) In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 4156, 5526, 6024, 34067, 44123, 2873, 4157, 5532, 7229, 34070, 44422, 3612, 4160, 5538, 7903, 34072, 45699, 3814, 4253, 5539, 9629, 34073, 3845, 4270, 5541, 34081, 80067, 3862, 4561, 5542, 30541, 34092, 92207, 4110, 4566, 5552, 30830, 34105, 92245, 4115, 4588, 5553, 34016, 35006, 4121, 5193, 5572, 34027, 35009, 4144, 5227, 5952, 34028, 35018, 4150, 5521, 6023, 34058, 35025; Behind Barry Works: 2807, 4930, 5199, 6619, 30499, 45690, 2857, 4936, 5224, 6634, 30506, 48431, 2861, 4942, 5239, 6686, 30825, 53808, 2874, 4953, 5322, 6695, 30828, 53809, 2885, 4979, 5619, 6960, 30841, 31625, 3803, 4983, 5637, 6989, 30847, 31638, 3822, 5029, 5643, 7027, 31618, 4141, 5043, 5668, 7200, 31806, 4247, 5051, 5900, 7202, 31874, 4248, 5080, 5967, 7325, 4277, 5164, 5972, 9466. SLS/196510

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/08/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80067
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Watford (1C)
   
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G)    
03/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80067    
09/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Woodham Brothers: Barry, South Glamorgan    

prev prev