Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 237 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5152 Week
» 16389 Month
» 249309 Year
» 1914685 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80068 on 21/08/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 21/08/1953 to Watford (1C)
Withdrawal Sun 02/10/1966
Service Life 13 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
1C   Watford (New) on 21/08/1953
73A   Stewarts Lane 5w/e 31/12/1959
75A   Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963
75B   Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
70B   Feltham 4w/e 08/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 02/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1C Watford w/e 22/08/1953
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
TOSTORE 70B Feltham P 06/06/1965
WDN   w/e 02/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/08/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80068
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Watford (1C)
   
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
02/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80068    
03/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev