Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 297 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5212 Week
» 16449 Month
» 249369 Year
» 1914745 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80069 on 30/09/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 30/09/1953 to Plaistow (33A)
Withdrawal Sun 23/01/1966
Service Life 12 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Cox and Danks (Park Royal)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
33A   Plaistow (New) on 30/09/1953
33B   Tilbury 4w/e 23/01/1954
87D   Swansea East Dock on 15/07/1962
70A   Nine Elms on 09/08/1964
     Withdrawn on 23/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 33A Plaistow on 30/09/1953
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/07/1962
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 2w/e 13/04/1964
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 10/08/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 17/08/1964
WDN   w/e 23/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/11/1961 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80069
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Plaistow (33A)
   
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
15/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
09/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
23/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80069    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Park Royal    

prev prev