Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80071 on 21/10/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Thu 21/10/1953 to Plaistow (33A)
Withdrawal Thu 30/07/1964
Service Life 10 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
33A   Plaistow (New) on 21/10/1953
33B   Tilbury 4w/e 23/01/1954
30A   Stratford w/e 21/07/1962
31B   March w/e 15/09/1962
56B   Ardsley w/e 08/12/1962
66E   Carstairs 4w/e 02/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 30/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 33A Plaistow on 22/10/1953
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 56B Ardsley w/e 08/12/1962
ALLOC 91NE   2w/e 15/12/1962
LOAN 66E Carstairs 5w/e 12/10/1963
LOAN 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 66E Carstairs 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 09/11/1963
WDN   w/e 30/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/10/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80071
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Plaistow (33A)
   
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
21/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (66E)    
30/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80071    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev