Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 908 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14314 Week
» 67330 Month
» 186857 Year
» 3213710 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80076 |
on |
23/12/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80076 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
15/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
21/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dumfries (67E) |
|
|
30/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80076 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|