Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 257 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5172 Week
» 16409 Month
» 249329 Year
» 1914705 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80077 on 12/01/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram BR5 #1306 (Belpaire firebox)
To Service Mon 12/01/1954 to Plaistow (33A)
Withdrawal Mon 12/10/1964
Service Life 10 yrs , 9 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
33A   Plaistow (New) on 12/01/1954
33B   Tilbury 4w/e 15/12/1956
30A   Stratford w/e 21/07/1962
31B   March w/e 15/09/1962
56B   Ardsley w/e 08/12/1962
67D   Ardrossan 4w/e 02/11/1963
67A   Corkerhill 4w/e 25/07/1964
     Withdrawn on 12/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 33A Plaistow on 12/01/1954
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 3w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 56B Ardsley w/e 08/12/1962
ALLOC 91NE   2w/e 15/12/1962
LOAN 67D Ardrossan 5w/e 12/10/1963
LOAN 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   on 12/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/01/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80077
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Plaistow (33A)
Diagram BR5 boiler fitted
   
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
21/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
25/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
12/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80077    
03/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev