Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80084 on 14/05/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 14/05/1954 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal Sun 13/06/1965
Service Life 11 yrs , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Birds (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
1E   Bletchley (New) on 14/05/1954
1A   Willesden w/e 07/11/1959
73B   Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 31/12/1959
75D   Stewarts Lane 5w/e 02/07/1962
75A   Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963
75B   Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
     Withdrawn on 13/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 15/05/1954
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 16/06/1962
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/05/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80084
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
13/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80084    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Morriston    

prev prev