Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 263 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5178 Week
» 16415 Month
» 249335 Year
» 1914711 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80086 on 14/06/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Mon 14/06/1954 to Bury (26D)
Withdrawal Mon 01/05/1967
Service Life 12 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at J McWilliams (Shettleston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
26D   Bury (New) on 14/06/1954
25A   Wakefield 4w/e 11/08/1956
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 23/02/1957
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 22/02/1958
64C   Dalry Road 4w/e 07/05/1960
66E   Carstairs 4w/e 22/10/1960
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 19/11/1960
     Withdrawn on 01/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26D Bury on 19/06/1954
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 66E Carstairs 4w/e 22/10/1960
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 19/11/1960
WDN   on 06/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/12/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42527 I, 47616 G, 48326 G, 80082 G, D3801, D5066 (New). Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12093/7, D3053, D5705/16, D8209. New Work: D3802, D3937-41, Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026, D5068-70. Test House: D9, D5067. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42315 G, 42413 G, 42629 G, 43903 G, 44248/334/368 I, 44444 G, 44514 G, 44580 I, 44596 G, 47547 I, 48009 G, 48097/146/386/446 G, 48543 I, 48716 G, 73045 I, 75058 I, 80086 G. Stripping: 43809/999. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay: 44235/429 I, 73013/127 I, 75052 I, 80141 I. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E (D5071-7) D8, 3 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D-E (D10-D12). Yard: 40413/680/925, 41975, 42312/54/61/507, 43370, 43531/665/759/998, 44140/50/274/326/79, 47299/309/482, 48205, 58190, 73129/32, 75054, 10100/800, D2/5, D2910, D5014, D5718, D8002. SLS/196001

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/06/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80086
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Bury (26D)
   
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (66E)    
19/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 80086    
28/02/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev