Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 232 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5147 Week
» 16384 Month
» 249304 Year
» 1914680 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80087 on 29/06/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 29/06/1954 to Bury (26D)
Withdrawal Sun 14/06/1964
Service Life 9 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
26D   Bury (New) on 29/06/1954
6H   Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956
75E   Three Bridges 5w/e 31/12/1959
73F   Ashford m/e 31/01/1960
75E   Three Bridges 3w/e 26/05/1961
71A   Eastleigh 4w/e 17/12/1962
70C   Guildford 4w/e 01/04/1963
70D   Basingstoke 4w/e 16/09/1963
     Withdrawn on 14/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26D Bury on 03/07/1954
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 73F Ashford 6w/e 09/02/1960
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 17/12/1962
ALLOC 70C Guildford 3w/e 01/04/1963
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 14/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/06/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80087
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Bury (26D)
   
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
17/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
01/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
14/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80087    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev