Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 297 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5212 Week
» 16449 Month
» 249369 Year
» 1914745 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80088 on 14/07/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 14/07/1954 to Bury (26D)
Withdrawal Sun 13/06/1965
Service Life 10 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Birds (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
26D   Bury (New) on 14/07/1954
6H   Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956
75E   Three Bridges 5w/e 31/12/1959
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 30/01/1963
75A   Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963
75B   Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
     Withdrawn on 13/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26D Bury on 17/07/1954
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 25/01/1963
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/02/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop, 1 bay) Paint shop-40563I, 43924G, 44606G, 47341G, 48538G, 73038G, 80066G, D5011 new. D/E Erecting shop-10000/1, 10203, 10800, 12000, 12082, 13083, 13169, D3568, D8014, new work-D3763-D3767 new. Outside-dED2. Test House-D5009/10. Erecting shop, 1 bay- 42374G, 42501G, 42520I, 44216I, 44518I, 47223G, 47379G, 47405G, 48003G, 48010G, 48317I, 48367G, 48409I, 73126I, 73159I, 75056G, 80088G, 42409 an 47376 stripping. Erecting shop, 2 bay- 42136I, 44477I, 48011I, 73125I, 73128I, 48050 stripping. Erecting shop, 3 bay- 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D/E D5012-8 new, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/Es, D5008. Yard- 40047, 40680, 42354, 43946, 43970, 47309, 48364 frames, 48517, 10100, D2910, D8001. SLS/195903

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/07/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80088
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Bury (26D)
   
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
13/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80088    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Morriston    

prev prev