Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 18 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2093 Week
» 27454 Month
» 260374 Year
» 1925750 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80089 on 03/08/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 03/08/1954 to Bury (26D)
Withdrawal Sun 02/10/1966
Service Life 12 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
26D   Bury (New) on 03/08/1954
6H   Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956
75E   Three Bridges 5w/e 31/12/1959
75D   Stewarts Lane 3w/e 30/01/1963
75A   Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963
75B   Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
70B   Feltham 4w/e 08/06/1965
70A   Nine Elms 4w/e 20/12/1965
     Withdrawn on 02/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26D Bury on 07/08/1954
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane 3w/e 25/01/1963
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
TOSTORE 70B Feltham P 06/06/1965
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 20/12/1965
WDN   w/e 02/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/01/1960 Eastleigh Works (Waiting works) Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. SLS/196002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/08/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80089
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Bury (26D)
   
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
20/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
02/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80089    
03/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev