Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 22 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2097 Week
» 27458 Month
» 260378 Year
» 1925754 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80092 on 24/09/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Mon 24/09/1954 to Kentish Town (14B)
Withdrawal Mon 26/09/1966
Service Life 12 yrs , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1966 at Campbells (Airdrie)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
14B   Kentish Town (New) on 24/09/1954
6H   Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956
1A   Willesden 4w/e 29/12/1956
6H   Bangor 4w/e 26/01/1957
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 30/11/1957
63A   Perth South 4w/e 09/04/1960
     Withdrawn on 26/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 14B Kentish Town on 25/09/1954
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956
LOAN 1A Willesden 4w/e 29/12/1956
EXLOAN 6H Bangor 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 09/04/1960
WDN   on 26/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/02/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop-MR1000, 42293 I, 42513 I, 44223 I, 48079 I. Diesel Erecting Shop-10000, 12074/5/98, 13173, D2220, D2901, D8012, ED4/6. New Work-6 diesel shunters D3937-3942 New. Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay -42053 I, 42152 I, 42372 G, 43903 I, 43967 G, 44203/7 I, 44222 G, 44509 I, 47287 G, 47469 G, 47596 G, 47648 I, 48187 G, 48413/7 G, 73070 G, 75038 I, 80092 G. Stripping-42340, 42516, 43410; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay: 8 d/e shunters D3943-49/51, 42540 Casual, 42396 Stripping; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-10100 Cut, D5014 Damage repairs, 10 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. d/e (D5075-84), 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. d/e. Test House-D10, D5072. Diesel Finishing Shop-D5015, D5073/4, D5716. Yard-40025, 40413/582/654, 42387, 43256/428/510/31/665/759, 43933/7/95, 44158/344/55/510, 47238, 47609, 48098/9, 58219/61, 92135, D4, D5, D6. SLS/196003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/09/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80092
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Kentish Town (14B)
   
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
29/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
26/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
26/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80092    
12/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev