Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 250 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5165 Week
» 16402 Month
» 249322 Year
» 1914698 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80093 on 11/10/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Mon 11/10/1954 to Bedford (15D)
Withdrawal Mon 26/09/1966
Service Life 11 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1966 at Campbells (Airdrie)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
15D   Bedford (New) on 11/10/1954
26D   Bury 4w/e 29/01/1955
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 25/02/1956
24E   Blackpool Central 4w/e 30/11/1957
63A   Perth South 4w/e 09/04/1960
     Withdrawn on 26/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 15D Bedford w/e 16/10/1954
LOAN 26D Bury 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 09/04/1960
WDN   on 26/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop; No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42512 (I), 42624 (G), 47598 (G), 48001 (I), 48218 (G), 48293 (I), D3791 New, D5025 New. Diesel Erecting Shop: 10203, 11126, 12036, 13038. New Work: 9 D-E. Sh. D3792-D3800new. Test House: D6, D3789/90. Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026/7/8, D4. Erecting Shop; No. 1 Bay; 42314 (G), 42403 (I), 42405 (I), 42422 (G), 42506 (I), 42523 (I), 42537 (G), 43914 (I), 44333 (I), 44435 (I), 44521 (I), 44557 (G), 47410 (G), 48004 (G), 73030 (I), 80093 (G). Stripping: 42311, 43865, 48674stripping. Erecting Shop; No. 2 Bay: 42227 (I), 42540 (G), 43949 (G), 44262 (G), 44267 casual, 44394 (G), 48331 (I), 75044 (I). Erecting Shop; No. 3 Bay: 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E. D5029-37uc 5 1-Co-Co-1. 2300 H.P. D-E D7-11uc. Yard: 40047, 40412, 40513/36/50/680, 42303/13/41/54, 43292/308/587/826 860/86, 44214/402, 47309/433/584/632, 48050, 58065, 73159, 10000/800, 12094, D2/5, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195911
15/10/1962 Inverurie Works In shops: 45461, 64595, 65910; waiting: 80093. Awaiting scrapping: 44008, 47168, 47536, 57331/378/613, 65313, 69204. Scrapped five weeks ended 12/10; 57445/671, 64598/607, 64604/30, 64480/637/794. SLS/196211
09/11/1962 Inverurie Works (In shops) In shops : 42262/9, 61397, 65910, 80093, D260, D6142/4/7. Ex Works 45461, 64595. Scrapped in last 4 weeks-44008/253, 47168, 47536, 57331/613, 65313, 69204. Awaiting scrap: 44254, 57378, 64478, 90513. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/10/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80093
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Bedford (15D)
   
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
26/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80093    
12/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev