Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 215 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5130 Week
» 16367 Month
» 249287 Year
» 1914663 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80094 on 25/10/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 25/10/1954 to Kentish Town (14B)
Withdrawal Sun 31/07/1966
Service Life 11 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1967 at Cohens (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
14B   Kentish Town (New) on 25/10/1954
6H   Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 17/10/1959
75E   Three Bridges 5w/e 31/12/1959
75D   Stewarts Lane 3w/e 30/01/1963
75A   Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963
75B   Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
70B   Feltham 4w/e 08/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 31/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 14B Kentish Town w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane 3w/e 25/01/1963
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
TOSTORE 70B Feltham P 06/06/1965
WDN   w/e 31/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/10/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80094
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Kentish Town (14B)
   
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
17/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
31/07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80094    
02/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev