Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 56 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17859 Week
» 70875 Month
» 190402 Year
» 3217255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80095 |
on |
13/11/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/03/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Ex-works) |
Erecting shop:-30060/6/133/247/701/88, 34011/5/27/8/33/61/82/92/106, 41304, 73082/112/4, 76019, 80039/42/83/137; Boxhill. Dump:-30770; Ex-works:- 32103, 34050/70, 41312; Waiting works:-30056/129/4035/504, 76055, 80140; Ex-works:- 32104 (75C), 73050 (82F), 80095 (6C) plate, 73118; On shed (damaged):- 34084. |
SLS/196004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/11/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80095 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to St Albans (14C) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
17/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
31/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
01/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
20/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
02/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80095 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|