Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 281 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5196 Week
» 16433 Month
» 249353 Year
» 1914729 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80098 on 22/12/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 22/12/1954 to Plaistow (33A)
Withdrawal Sat 24/07/1965
Service Life 10 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
33A   Plaistow (New) on 22/12/1954
33B   Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
81A   Old Oak Common on 15/07/1962
89A   Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/09/1962
89B   Croes Newydd 2w/e 17/11/1962
89C   Machynlleth w/e 09/03/1963
     Withdrawn on 24/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 33A Plaistow on 22/12/1954
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/07/1962
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 30/03/1963
WDN   w/e 24/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303
06/02/1966 Woodham Bros. Yard, Barry 5700 0-6-0PT-3612, 3738, 4612, 9629/81/2. 9400 0-6-0PT*9466. 4500 2-6-2T*-4561/6. 4575 2-6-2T*-4588, 5521/6/32/8/9/41/2/52/3/72. 5101 2-6-2T*-4110/5/21/41/4/56/60, 5164/93/9. 5600 0-6-2T-5619/37/68, 5693**, 6619/34/86/96. 4200 2-8-0T*-4247/8/53/70/7. 5205 2-8-0T*-5224/7/39. 7200 2-8-2T*7200/2/29. 4300 2-6-0*-5322, 7325. Hall 4-6-0*-4930/6/42/53/79/83, 5900/52/67/72. Modified Hall 4-6-0*-6989. 7903. Castle 4-6-0*-5029/43/51/80, 7027. King 4-6-0*-6023/4. 2800 2-8-0*-2807/57/9/61/73/4. 2884 2-8-0*-2885, 3802/3/14/7/22/45/50/5/62. Q 0-6-0*-30541. N 2-6-0-31874. U 2-6-0-31618/25/38, 31806. S15 4-6-0*-30499, 30506, 30825/8/30/41/7. WC and BB 4-6-2-34010/6/27/8/39/46/58/67/70/2/3/81/92/105. MN 4-6-2-35005/6/9/18/25. 4F 0-6-0 M.R.*-43924. 4F 0-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44123/422. SMT 4-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44901/5163/293/337/79/491. 8F 2-8-0-48173/431/518/624. S.D.J.R. 7F 2-8-0*-53808/9. Jubilee 4-6-0-45690/9. 4MT 2-6-0 B.R.-76017. 4MT 2-6-4T B1R.-80064/72/9/80/97/8/100/4/5/35/50. 9F 2-10-0-92207/14/9/40/5. Total: 152 locos. NOTES : * These 18 classes extinct on B.R. **5693 previously wrongly listed as 6692, even though latter was working at Stourbridge. The locos. above come from as far apart as Cornwall and Carlisle. SLS/196603
07/07/1968 Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. SLS/196810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/12/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80098
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Plaistow (33A)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
15/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
24/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80098    

prev prev