Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 3 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2078 Week
» 27439 Month
» 260359 Year
» 1925735 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80099 on 17/01/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 17/01/1955 to Plaistow (33A)
Withdrawal Sat 08/05/1965
Service Life 10 yrs, 3 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Cohens (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
33A   Plaistow (New) on 17/01/1955
33B   Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
30A   Stratford w/e 23/06/1962
87D   Swansea East Dock on 15/07/1962
89C   Machynlleth on 14/07/1963
     Withdrawn on 08/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 33A Plaistow on 17/01/1955
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 30A Stratford 2w/e 23/06/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/07/1962
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 27/07/1963
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 03/08/1963
WDN   w/e 08/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/06/1961 Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. SLS/196107
09/07/1961 Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) Waiting Works: D237, 60814, 61020, 63448, 67731/69, 78015, 90415. Ex-Works: 60872, 60928/42, 61273, 61303, 61448/64, 65801/93, 67636/90, 80099, 80100, 90465, 90710, 92147/92. SLS/196108
09/11/1963 Oswestry Works 3630 being cut up, 3862(6C), 9657(6D), 41209, 80099(6F). Nr. Works: 25T 4 wheel, GWR brake van and 4 wheel ex-Cambrian coach. SLS/196312

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/01/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80099
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Plaistow (33A)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
14/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
08/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80099    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev