Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 275 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5190 Week
» 16427 Month
» 249347 Year
» 1914723 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80102 on 01/03/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 01/03/1955 to Plaistow (33A)
Withdrawal Sun 05/12/1965
Service Life 10 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1966 at Cohens (Ringwood Goods yard)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
33A   Plaistow (New) on 01/03/1955
33B   Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
81A   Old Oak Common on 15/07/1962
89A   Shrewsbury 4w/e 15/12/1962
6H   Bangor w/e 27/06/1964
6D   Shrewsbury w/e 19/09/1964
70D   Eastleigh w/e 01/05/1965
     Withdrawn on 05/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 33A Plaistow on 01/03/1955
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/07/1962
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 10/05/1965
WDN   w/e 05/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/03/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80102
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Plaistow (33A)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
15/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
01/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
05/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80102    
03/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Ringwood Goods yard    

prev prev