Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 248 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5163 Week
» 16400 Month
» 249320 Year
» 1914696 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80103 on 16/03/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Wed 16/03/1955 to Plaistow (33A)
Withdrawal Wed 29/08/1962
Service Life 7 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1962 at Locomotive Works (Stratford)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
33A   Plaistow (New) on 16/03/1955
33B   Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
     Withdrawn on 29/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 33A Plaistow on 16/03/1955
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
TOSTORE   on 18/06/1962
WDN   on 29/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/06/1962 1st Standard Class withdrawal The first B.R. engine to be withdrawn is 80103, which since 18th June has been stored in Plaistow shed; it was sent under its own steam to Stratford on 29th August and is now cut up ! SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/03/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80103
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Plaistow (33A)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
29/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 80103    
09/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford    

prev prev