Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80105 on 19/04/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 19/04/1955 to Plaistow (33A)
Withdrawal Sat 24/07/1965
Service Life 10 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
33A   Plaistow (New) on 19/04/1955
33B   Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
89C   Machynlleth on 15/07/1962
89A   Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/09/1962
89C   Machynlleth 4w/e 06/10/1962
89B   Croes Newydd w/e 23/02/1963
89C   Machynlleth w/e 09/03/1963
     Withdrawn on 24/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 33A Plaistow on 19/04/1955
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/07/1962
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 30/03/1963
WDN   w/e 24/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/08/1963 Oswestry Works 3630, 48739 (89A), 73035 an 80105. On shed dump were 1432/8, 5421, 7428/34 an 7033 (no name or number plates). SLS/196309
15/11/1963 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: 45494, 49395, D1031/72, 27004 and three Brush Type 4s (D1500 series). Paint Shop Yard: 44677, 45059, 45574, 48094/371/502/760, 73135, 75000, 82000, 92008, D221/49, D1030. Yard: 42668, 44500, 44676/86/762/892/904, 45139/263/280/317/736, 46119/43, 46227/31/2, 46452, 48411, 70025, 78028/62, 84013, 90630, 92068/81/178. Electric Loco. Shop: E3019, 26005/16/20, 27001/2. Outside Erecting Shop: 44696, 44726, 45072/137, 46489, 78013, 92071/109, D200/6/15, D374/81/95. Erecting Shop: 44671/712/33/59/858/927, 45013/25/106/293/403/29/34/7/91, 46434/7, 48472/725/31, 70045, 77002, 78033/55, 80105, 92013/153/68/74/82/234, D222/8/9/31/3/45/52/93/7, D303, D6769, D8001. Cut-up Shop: remains of 46158 remains. Locos. cut up at Crewe w/e 19/10: 42556/853, 45100/315, 46223, 49104; w/e 26/10-42238/79, 46224, 49408, 84012; w/e 2/11-45625/45, 46149/222/42; w/e 9/11-42157/288/319, 44309, 45521, 45706; w/e 16/11-42442, 45591, 46126/58/230/49. New construction comprised Brush Type 4s (D1500s), Western Type 4s (D1000s). SLS/196312
06/02/1966 Woodham Bros. Yard, Barry 5700 0-6-0PT-3612, 3738, 4612, 9629/81/2. 9400 0-6-0PT*9466. 4500 2-6-2T*-4561/6. 4575 2-6-2T*-4588, 5521/6/32/8/9/41/2/52/3/72. 5101 2-6-2T*-4110/5/21/41/4/56/60, 5164/93/9. 5600 0-6-2T-5619/37/68, 5693**, 6619/34/86/96. 4200 2-8-0T*-4247/8/53/70/7. 5205 2-8-0T*-5224/7/39. 7200 2-8-2T*7200/2/29. 4300 2-6-0*-5322, 7325. Hall 4-6-0*-4930/6/42/53/79/83, 5900/52/67/72. Modified Hall 4-6-0*-6989. 7903. Castle 4-6-0*-5029/43/51/80, 7027. King 4-6-0*-6023/4. 2800 2-8-0*-2807/57/9/61/73/4. 2884 2-8-0*-2885, 3802/3/14/7/22/45/50/5/62. Q 0-6-0*-30541. N 2-6-0-31874. U 2-6-0-31618/25/38, 31806. S15 4-6-0*-30499, 30506, 30825/8/30/41/7. WC and BB 4-6-2-34010/6/27/8/39/46/58/67/70/2/3/81/92/105. MN 4-6-2-35005/6/9/18/25. 4F 0-6-0 M.R.*-43924. 4F 0-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44123/422. SMT 4-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44901/5163/293/337/79/491. 8F 2-8-0-48173/431/518/624. S.D.J.R. 7F 2-8-0*-53808/9. Jubilee 4-6-0-45690/9. 4MT 2-6-0 B.R.-76017. 4MT 2-6-4T B1R.-80064/72/9/80/97/8/100/4/5/35/50. 9F 2-10-0-92207/14/9/40/5. Total: 152 locos. NOTES : * These 18 classes extinct on B.R. **5693 previously wrongly listed as 6692, even though latter was working at Stourbridge. The locos. above come from as far apart as Cornwall and Carlisle. SLS/196603
07/07/1968 Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. SLS/196810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/04/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80105
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Plaistow (33A)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
15/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
23/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
24/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80105    

prev prev