Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 256 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5171 Week
» 16408 Month
» 249328 Year
» 1914704 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80106 on 22/10/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service Mon 22/10/1954 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Mon 12/10/1964
Service Life 9 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
61A   Kittybrewster (New) on 22/10/1954
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 11/05/1957
     Withdrawn on 12/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 61A Kittybrewster on 22/10/1954
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   on 12/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/10/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80106
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
11/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
12/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80106    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev