Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 217 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5132 Week
» 16369 Month
» 249289 Year
» 1914665 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80107 on 29/10/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service Mon 29/10/1954 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Mon 14/09/1964
Service Life 9 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
61A   Kittybrewster (New) on 29/10/1954
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 11/05/1957
     Withdrawn on 14/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 61A Kittybrewster on 29/10/1954
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   on 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1954 N.E. Miscellany The 9.0 a.m. train from Sunderland to Newcastle continues to, provide an interesting variety of locomotives. New 2-6-0 B.R. Std. Class 3MT No. 77014 has been a fairly regular performer recently but on 23rd October, an A5 tank freshly out of Darlington works after repair, was on the train. Later that same day, a taper-boiler L.M.S. 2-6-4 tank hauled the 12.30 p.m. train from Sunderland to Newcastle. On 14th November, L.M.R. Jubilee No. 45585 was observed running northwards across Durham viaduct with an excursion bound for Newcastle.
On 17th November, three new standard 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 80107/8/9 were observed at Stannington coupled together and in steam heading northwards en route for the Scottish Region.
SLS/195412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/10/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80107
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
11/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
14/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80107    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev