Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 225 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5140 Week
» 16377 Month
» 249297 Year
» 1914673 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80110 on 18/11/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service Sat 18/11/1954 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Sat 08/05/1965
Service Life 10 yrs, 5 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
61A   Kittybrewster (New) on 18/11/1954
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 06/07/1957
66E   Carstairs 4w/e 05/10/1963
66A   Polmadie 5w/e 30/05/1964
     Withdrawn on 08/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 61A Kittybrewster on 18/11/1954
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 66E Carstairs 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 5w/e 13/06/1964
WDN   w/e 08/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/11/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80110
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (66E)    
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
08/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80110    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev