Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 288 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5203 Week
» 16440 Month
» 249360 Year
» 1914736 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80111 on 26/11/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service Tue 26/11/1954 to Polmadie (66A)
Withdrawal Tue 29/11/1966
Service Life 12 yrs , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1967 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
66A   Polmadie (New) on 26/11/1954
61A   Kittybrewster 4w/e 11/05/1957
67A   Corkerhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
67B   Hurlford 4w/e 01/07/1961
66F   Beattock 5w/e 30/04/1966
     Withdrawn on 29/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66A Polmadie on 26/11/1954
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 66F Beattock 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN   on 29/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/05/1955 Clyde Coast Of the batch of standard class 5 engines allotted to Polmadie, Nos. 73055-73064 all work alongside class 4 2-6-4 tanks on passenger duties. The latest arrivals are 73075/6 with large tenders. Standard 2-6-4 tanks now handle almost half of the Clyde Coast passenger traffic, the remainder being of Fairburn variety. No. 80023 spent a short while on loan recently to Ladyburn, likewise No. 80003 at Princes Pier, but none of these engines is as yet stationed at Greenock. Latest arrivals at Polmadie are Doncaster-built Nos. 80111/5. New light 2-6-0 of classes 3 and 4 appear on night freight duties from the Motherwell direction; No. 77009, for a time stabled at Greenock, is now at Polmadie, while No. 77008 is at Princes Pier on passenger duties. On 25th June, No. 76001, of Perth, appeared on an excursion from Glenboig to Gourock. Class 3F Nos. 57552/6 and class 2F No. 57268 still handle the principal freight turns from Greenock; Caley Bogies Nos. 54456 an 54506 appear quite regularly on freight duty and at the end of June No. 54497 emerged after being in store for over six months. On Friday, 1st July, a 'Starlight' special left Gourock for the south at 6.45 p.m., doubleheaded by Nos. 73057 an 72000. Earlier, the stock for this train had been worked down by compound No. 41155 of Ayr shed, a type now very rare on this line. SLS/195508

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/11/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80111
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
11/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Beattock (66F)    
29/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80111    
02/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev