Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 981 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2055 Week
» 27416 Month
» 260336 Year
» 1925712 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80113 on 14/12/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service Fri 14/12/1954 to Polmadie (66A)
Withdrawal Fri 02/09/1966
Service Life 11 yrs, 8 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1966 at Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
66A   Polmadie (New) on 14/12/1954
61A   Kittybrewster 4w/e 06/07/1957
61C   Keith 4w/e 02/07/1960
64G   Hawick 4w/e 01/07/1961
64A   St Margarets 5w/e 29/01/1966
     Withdrawn on 02/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66A Polmadie on 14/12/1954
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 64G Hawick 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 05/02/1966
WDN   on 02/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/12/1954 York MPD Fort William shed is not often represented at York, but on 14/12/54 62031 (K1-63D) was at York shed after a visit to Doncaster Works. 67745 (L1-34D) was at York on 15/12/54 after a visit to Darlington, and 67780 (L1-34E) in similar circumstances on 31/12/54. On 20/12/54 new BR Standard 2-6-4T 80113. from Doncaster Works was at York, en route for the Scottish Region, and fitted with tablet exchange apparatus. On the same date a surprising arrival at York was 69369 (N5-34E), en route for Darlington Works for repair owing to an alleged surplus of repair work at Gorton with a corresponding shortage at Darlington. 69369 was apparently overcome by its long journey, as a hot bearing developed necessitating attention at York shed; it reappeared in York shed yard on 30/12/54. 63755 (O1-54B), fitted with additional pumps for the Tyne Dock-Consett working, was also at York on the same date. On 28/12/54 46469 (30E) was at York after a visit to Darlington Works. 44669 (68A) worked the Holbeck duty on the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City-Scarborough, etc., on 28/12/54, and the same duty was taken on 30/12/54 by 44792 (68A). 73066 (20A) has continued appearances on this turn, while 73065 (19B) has also visited York on Millhouses turns, particularly the 10.20 a.m. Bristol-Newcastle. On 29/12/54 the 3.55 p.m. relief arrival at York from Birmingham (New Street) was worked by 42756 (17B). On 31/12/54 new BR Standard 2-6-2T 82029 was at York on arrival in the North Eastern Region from Swindon. Ex-Works engines on shed or this date also included 61215, (B1-53B), 67780 (L1-34E), and 90382 (AY-53A). SLS/195501

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/12/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80113
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hawick (64G)    
29/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
02/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80113    
12/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane    

prev prev