Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 702 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14108 Week
» 67124 Month
» 186651 Year
» 3213504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80114 |
on |
29/12/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
66A |
Polmadie |
on |
29/12/1954 |
ALLOC |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
4w/e |
22/10/1960 |
ALLOC |
64G |
Hawick |
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/12/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80114 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
11/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hawick (64G) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80114 |
|
|
04/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane |
|
|